Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1143 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/05/2022

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1143
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 2-2.1.
Synopsis:  Duration of the first regular session. Changes the deadline
for the general assembly to adjourn sine die in an odd-numbered year
from April 29 to April 15.
Effective:  July 1, 2022.
Steuerwald
January 6, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative
Procedures.
2022	IN 1143—LS 6747/DI 92 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1143
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning the
general assembly.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 2-2.1-1-2, AS AMENDED BY P.L.133-2021,
2 SECTION 2, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 2. (a) The first regular session of each term of the
4 general assembly shall convene on the third Tuesday after the first
5 Monday of November of each even-numbered year to do the following:
6 (1) Organize itself.
7 (2) Elect its officers.
8 (3) Receive the oath of office.
9 (b) If a special session is called before the date set in subsection (a),
10 then the organization, election, and receiving the oath of office shall be
11 held on the first day of the special session.
12 (c) The general assembly shall then adjourn until a day:
13 (1) certain fixed by a concurrent resolution; or
14 (2) when the gavel of each house falls in the presence of a quorum
15 whether or not a day certain to reconvene in session has been
16 fixed.
17 (d) The general assembly shall reconvene in session no later than
2022	IN 1143—LS 6747/DI 92 2
1 the second Monday in January of the following year.
2 (e) The first regular session of each term of the general assembly
3 shall adjourn sine die as follows:
4 (1) Not later than November 15 in calendar year 2021.
5 (2) Not later than April 29 15 in any odd-numbered year
6 beginning after December 31, 2022.
7 SECTION 2. IC 2-2.1-4-4, AS ADDED BY P.L.229-2011,
8 SECTION 37, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
9 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "final day of session"
10 means:
11 (1) April 29 15 in odd-numbered years and March 14 in
12 even-numbered years; or
13 (2) a date earlier than April 29 15 in odd-numbered years and
14 March 14 in even-numbered years, if the presiding officers of
15 each body have:
16 (A) jointly agreed; and
17 (B) publicly announced;
18 that the earlier date will be the final day of session.
2022	IN 1143—LS 6747/DI 92