House | 03/07/2022 | Public Law 33 | ||
House | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
Senate | 02/24/2022 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/22/2022 | Returned to the House without amendments | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 217: yeas 47, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senator Glick added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/17/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture | ||
House | 01/14/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Senate sponsor: Senator Leising | ||
House | 01/13/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 16: yeas 86, nays 1 | ||
House | 01/10/2022 | Representatives Aylesworth, Cherry, Thompson added as coauthors | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Development | ||
House | 01/06/2022 | Authored by Representative Lehe |