Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Crider, Becker, Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 161: yeas 59, nays 34
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #11 (Nisly) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Appeal the ruling of the chair (Austin); ruling of the chair sustained. Roll Call 134: yeas 63, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #14 (Austin) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #15 (Olthoff) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Appeal the ruling of the chair (Shackleford); ruling of the chair sustained. Roll Call 133: yeas 62, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Shackleford) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #6 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representatives Olthoff, Davisson J., Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Clere
|
|
|