House
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 143
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 349: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 360: yeas 75, nays 17
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Yoder
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Davisson J., Barrett and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Clere and Fleming
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 41, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Cosponsor: Senator Breaux
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Crider, Charbonneau, Busch
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 100: yeas 90, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Clere) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Coauthored by Representatives Barrett, Lehman, Fleming
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Clere
|
|
|