House
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Law 34
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Returned to the House without amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as third sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 196: yeas 42, nays 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon and Rogers
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 76: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Representative Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative McNamara added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative DeVon
|
|
|