House
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 72
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 312: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Charbonneau added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Mishler
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Representative GiaQuinta added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Representative Brown, T. added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Karickhoff
|
|
|