Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1201 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 01/05/2022

                             
Introduced Version
HOUSE BILL No. 1201
_____
DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
Citations Affected:  IC 16-41-21.2.
Synopsis: Radon testing in school buildings. Requires the person or
entity having authority over a public school building to test for radon
in the lowest level of the school building before January 1, 2025, and
report the test results to the state department of health. Requires the
state department of health to record the test results in a data base and
to use the data base in its efforts to reduce the health risks of radon to
the people of Indiana.
Effective:  July 1, 2022.
Andrade
January 6, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs.
2022	IN 1201—LS 6055/DI 55 Introduced
Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
  Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in  this  style  type. Also, the
word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
  Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
HOUSE BILL No. 1201
A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
health.
Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
1 SECTION 1. IC 16-41-21.2 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3 JULY 1, 2022]:
4 Chapter 21.2. Radon in School Buildings
5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "school building" means any
6 building:
7 (1) that is used by a public school (as defined in
8 IC 20-18-2-15(2)), including a charter school (as defined in
9 IC 20-18-2-2.5); and
10 (2) in which:
11 (A) classroom instruction of students occurs; or
12 (B) students are present for any period during a school
13 day.
14 Sec. 2. As used in this chapter, "student" refers to a student in
15 any grade from kindergarten through grade 12.
16 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "radon" refers to the colorless,
17 odorless, tasteless, radioactive gas that:
2022	IN 1201—LS 6055/DI 55 2
1 (1) forms naturally when radioactive metals break down in
2 rocks, soil, and groundwater;
3 (2) can enter homes and other buildings; and
4 (3) is a recognized cause of lung cancer.
5 Sec. 4. (a) The person or entity having authority over a school
6 building shall test the air in the lowest level of the school building
7 before January 1, 2025, to determine whether the concentration of
8 radon in the air equals or exceeds the United States Environmental
9 Protection Agency recommended action level of four (4) picocuries
10 per liter.
11 (b) The person or entity having authority over a school building
12 that is subject to testing under this section shall seek any state or
13 federal grant money that is available to pay the cost of the radon
14 testing.
15 Sec. 5. (a) The person or entity having authority over a school
16 building shall report to the state department the results of the
17 testing conducted in the school building under section 4 of this
18 chapter.
19 (b) The state department shall:
20 (1) record the test results reported under subsection (a) in a
21 data base; and
22 (2) use the data base in its efforts to reduce the health risks of
23 radon to the people of Indiana.
2022	IN 1201—LS 6055/DI 55