House
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 162
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 247: yeas 92, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 202: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman and Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 51: yeas 86, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Young J
|
|
|