House
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 93
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 315: yeas 75, nays 17
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Tomes added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 235: yeas 38, nays 10
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Senator Boehnlein added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Senator Donato added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senator Rogers added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Brown L
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 73, nays 18
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Austin) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #4 (King) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Representatives Mayfield, Fleming, Jeter C added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative King
|
|
|