House
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 74
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 248: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representatives Vermilion A, Olthoff, Jackson added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Representatives DeVon, Olthoff, Jackson removed as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 41, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Crider
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 53: yeas 86, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Jackson added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2022
|
Representative Olthoff added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Representative DeVon added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Ziemke
|
|
|