House
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 168
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 375: yeas 33, nays 17
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 395: yeas 70, nays 28
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Rogers added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Rogers removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Goodrich added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Smith V removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Goodrich removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Byrne, Qaddoura and Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Clere, Goodrich and DeLaney
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 302: yeas 34, nays 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #6 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 273: yeas 14, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #4 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 272: yeas 12, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 271: yeas 12, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #7 (Young M) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Raatz
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 73, nays 17
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Smith V) failed; Roll Call 132: yeas 28, nays 63
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Behning) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Representatives Carbaugh, Davis M, Goodrich added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
House
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Representative Behning
|
|
|