House
|
03/21/2022
|
Public Law 174
|
|
|
House
|
03/21/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 376: yeas 44, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 396: yeas 83, nays 14
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Buchanan added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Griffin removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Buchanan removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Heine added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Pryor removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Representative Heine removed as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Holdman, Pol and Buchanan
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Bassler and Griffin
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Slager, Heine, Torr and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Leonard and Pryor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 275: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Bassler) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Bassler, Holdman, Buchanan
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 126: yeas 92, nays 3
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Porter) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #5 (Pryor) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #4 (Porter) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Heine added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Representative Leonard
|
|
|