House
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 97
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 329: yeas 66, nays 24
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 37, nays 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Crider and Boots
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 85, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Representative Morris added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representatives Pressel and Austin added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Austin removed as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce, Small Business and Economic Development
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representative Austin
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Representative Cherry
|
|
|