House
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 146
|
|
|
House
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 352: yeas 36, nays 14
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 366: yeas 94, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Mishler and Pol
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Thompson, Smaltz, Hatcher and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Porter
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 205: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Cosponsor: Senator Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Young M, Mishler, Freeman
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 83: yeas 89, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Coauthored by Representatives Thompson, Smaltz, Porter
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|