House
|
03/14/2022
|
Public Law 121
|
|
|
House
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 337: yeas 86, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 305: yeas 40, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senator Messmer added as second sponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Senate sponsor: Senator Alting
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 88, nays 2
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Representative Bartels added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Bartels) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Representative Clere added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Representative Smaltz
|
|
|