Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1303 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note March 9, 2022
Fiscal Note March 1, 2022
Fiscal Note February 28, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note January 31, 2022
Fiscal Note January 26, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 11, 2022

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Amended

Bill March 7, 2022
Bill February 22, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022