Senate | 02/17/2022 | Senator Ford Jon added as cosponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senator Becker added as third sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/14/2022 | Senator Busch added as second sponsor | ||
Senate | 02/10/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Senate sponsor: Senator Charbonneau | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 90: yeas 92, nays 0 | ||
House | 01/24/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/20/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Coauthored by Representatives Zent, Vermilion, Fleming | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | Authored by Representative Barrett |