*HC1007* November 16, 2021 HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION No. 3 DIGEST OF RESOLUTION A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive Order 20-02. Nisly, Jacob, Prescott, Payne, Jeter, Borders, Snow November 16, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures. HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 November 16, 2021 Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) HOUSE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION No. 3 1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public 2 health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive 3 Order 20-02. 4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 5 20-02 declaring a public health emergency on March 6, 2020, 6 under the authority of Indiana's Emergency Management and 7 Disaster Law (IC 10-14-3) in response to the global 8 coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) pandemic; 9 Whereas, IC 10-14-3-12 provides that a state of disaster 10 emergency declared under IC 10-14-3 may not continue for 11 more than thirty (30) days unless the state of disaster 12 emergency is renewed by the governor; 13 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 14 20-17 renewing the public health emergency declared on 15 March 6, 2020, for an additional thirty (30) days effective April 16 5, 2020; 17 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 18 20-25 renewing the public health emergency originally 19 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on April 5, 2020, for 20 an additional thirty (30) days effective May 5, 2020; 21 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 22 20-30 renewing the public health emergency originally 23 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on May 5, 2020, for 24 an additional thirty (30) days effective June 4, 2020; 25 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 2 1 20-34 renewing the public health emergency originally 2 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on June 4, 2020, for 3 an additional thirty (30) days effective July 4, 2020; 4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 5 20-38 renewing the public health emergency originally 6 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on July 4, 2020, for 7 an additional thirty (30) days effective August 3, 2020; 8 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 9 20-41 renewing the public health emergency originally 10 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 3, 2020, 11 for an additional thirty (30) days effective September 2, 2020; 12 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 13 20-44 renewing the public health emergency originally 14 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on September 2, 15 2020, for an additional thirty (30) days effective October 2, 16 2020; 17 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 18 20-47 renewing the public health emergency originally 19 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on October 2, 2020, 20 for the eighth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 21 November 1, 2020; 22 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 23 20-49 renewing the public health emergency originally 24 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on November 1, 2020, 25 for the ninth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 26 December 1, 2020; 27 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 28 20-52 renewing the public health emergency originally 29 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on December 1, 2020, 30 for the tenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 31 December 31, 2020; 32 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 33 21-03 renewing the public health emergency originally 34 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on December 31, 35 2020, for the eleventh time and an additional thirty (30) days 36 effective January 30, 2021; HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 3 1 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 2 21-05 renewing the public health emergency originally 3 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on January 30, 2021, 4 for the twelfth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 5 March 1, 2021; 6 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 7 21-08 renewing the public health emergency originally 8 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on March 1, 2021, for 9 the thirteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 10 March 31, 2021; 11 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 12 21-11 renewing the public health emergency originally 13 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on March 31, 2021, 14 for the fourteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days 15 effective May 1, 2021; 16 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 17 21-14 renewing the public health emergency originally 18 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on May 1, 2021, for 19 the fifteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 20 June 1, 2021; 21 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 22 21-16 renewing the public health emergency originally 23 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on June 1, 2021, for 24 the sixteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 25 July 1, 2021; 26 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 27 21-18 renewing the public health emergency originally 28 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on July 1, 2021, for 29 the seventeenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective 30 August 1, 2021; 31 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 32 21-22 renewing the public health emergency originally 33 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 1, 2021, 34 for the eighteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days 35 effective August 31, 2021; 36 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 37 21-26 renewing the public health emergency originally HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 4 1 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 31, 2021, 2 for the nineteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days 3 effective October 1, 2021; 4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order 5 21-28 renewing the public health emergency originally 6 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on October 1, 2021, 7 for the twentieth time and an additional thirty (30) days 8 effective November 1, 2021; 9 Whereas, IC 10-14-3-12 authorizes the general assembly, by 10 concurrent resolution, to terminate a state of disaster 11 emergency at any time and specifies that, if the general 12 assembly terminates a state of disaster emergency under the 13 statute, the governor shall issue an executive order or 14 proclamation ending the state of disaster emergency; 15 Whereas, The general assembly finds that Hoosiers are 16 responsible for and capable of protecting the health and safety 17 of themselves and their families; 18 Whereas, The general assembly finds that Hoosiers have been 19 educated and informed on how to properly protect themselves 20 and their families from COVID-19; 21 Whereas, The general assembly finds that the state of 22 emergency is no longer necessary to protect the health, safety, 23 and welfare of the residents of Indiana; 24 Whereas, The general assembly finds that state agency 25 actions initiated in response to COVID-19, regardless of 26 whether the agency actions were initiated under the authority 27 of the declared public health emergency, are no longer 28 necessary to protect the health, safety, and welfare of the 29 residents of Indiana; 30 Whereas, The general assembly finds that the various 31 restrictions imposed upon the residents of Indiana to implement 32 the state of disaster emergency are no longer necessary to 33 protect the health, safety, and welfare of the residents of 34 Indiana; and 35 Whereas, The general assembly recommends that state 36 agencies terminate, withdraw, or otherwise revoke all state HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 5 1 agency actions, policies, or orders initiated in response to 2 COVID-19: Therefore, 3 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives 4 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana, 5 the Senate concurring: 6 SECTION 1. That the General Assembly terminates the 7 public health emergency that was originally declared by the 8 Governor on March 6, 2020, and renewed for the twentieth time 9 on November 1, 2021, effective immediately upon the passage 10 of this resolution by the Senate. 11 SECTION 2. That the General Assembly determines that any 12 actions taken by the Governor or any requirements issued by the 13 Governor pursuant to his authority under an emergency 14 declaration are also hereby terminated. 15 SECTION 3. That copies of this resolution be transmitted by 16 the Principal Clerk of the House of Representatives to Governor 17 Eric Holcomb. HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92