Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HCR0003 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 11/16/2021

                            *HC1007*
November 16, 2021
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 3
DIGEST OF RESOLUTION
A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public
health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive
Order 20-02.
Nisly, Jacob, Prescott, Payne, Jeter,
Borders, Snow
November 16, 2021, read first time and referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative
Procedures.
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92  November 16, 2021
Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
HOUSE CONCURRENT
RESOLUTION No. 3
1 A CONCURRENT RESOLUTION terminating the public
2 health emergency first declared on March 6, 2020, in Executive
3 Order 20-02.
4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
5 20-02 declaring a public health emergency on March 6, 2020,
6 under the authority of Indiana's Emergency Management and
7 Disaster Law (IC 10-14-3) in response to the global
8 coronavirus disease 2019 (COVID-19) pandemic; 
9 Whereas, IC 10-14-3-12 provides that a state of disaster
10 emergency declared under IC 10-14-3 may not continue for
11 more than thirty (30) days unless the state of disaster
12 emergency is renewed by the governor; 
13 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
14 20-17 renewing the public health emergency declared on
15 March 6, 2020, for an additional thirty (30) days effective April
16 5, 2020; 
17 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
18 20-25 renewing the public health emergency originally
19 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on April 5, 2020, for
20 an additional thirty (30) days effective May 5, 2020; 
21 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
22 20-30 renewing the public health emergency originally
23 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on May 5, 2020, for
24 an additional thirty (30) days effective June 4, 2020; 
25 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 2
1 20-34 renewing the public health emergency originally
2 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on June 4, 2020, for
3 an additional thirty (30) days effective July 4, 2020; 
4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
5 20-38 renewing the public health emergency originally
6 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on July 4, 2020, for
7 an additional thirty (30) days effective August 3, 2020; 
8 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
9 20-41 renewing the public health emergency originally
10 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 3, 2020,
11 for an additional thirty (30) days effective September 2, 2020; 
12 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
13 20-44 renewing the public health emergency originally
14 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on September 2,
15 2020, for an additional thirty (30) days effective October 2,
16 2020; 
17 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
18 20-47 renewing the public health emergency originally
19 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on October 2, 2020,
20 for the eighth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
21 November 1, 2020; 
22 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
23 20-49 renewing the public health emergency originally
24 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on November 1, 2020,
25 for the ninth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
26 December 1, 2020;
27 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
28 20-52 renewing the public health emergency originally
29 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on December 1, 2020,
30 for the tenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
31 December 31, 2020; 
32 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
33 21-03 renewing the public health emergency originally
34 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on December 31,
35 2020, for the eleventh time and an additional thirty (30) days
36 effective January 30, 2021; 
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 3
1 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
2 21-05 renewing the public health emergency originally
3 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on January 30, 2021,
4 for the twelfth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
5 March 1, 2021; 
6 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
7 21-08 renewing the public health emergency originally
8 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on March 1, 2021, for
9 the thirteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
10 March 31, 2021; 
11 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
12 21-11 renewing the public health emergency originally
13 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on March 31, 2021,
14 for the fourteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days
15 effective May 1, 2021; 
16 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
17 21-14 renewing the public health emergency originally
18 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on May 1, 2021, for
19 the fifteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
20 June 1, 2021; 
21 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
22 21-16 renewing the public health emergency originally
23 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on June 1, 2021, for
24 the sixteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
25 July 1, 2021; 
26 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
27 21-18 renewing the public health emergency originally
28 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on July 1, 2021, for
29 the seventeenth time and an additional thirty (30) days effective
30 August 1, 2021; 
31 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
32 21-22 renewing the public health emergency originally
33 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 1, 2021,
34 for the eighteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days
35 effective August 31, 2021; 
36 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
37 21-26 renewing the public health emergency originally
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 4
1 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on August 31, 2021,
2 for the nineteenth time and an additional thirty (30) days
3 effective October 1, 2021; 
4 Whereas, Governor Eric Holcomb issued Executive Order
5 21-28 renewing the public health emergency originally
6 declared on March 6, 2020, and renewed on October 1, 2021,
7 for the twentieth time and an additional thirty (30) days
8 effective November 1, 2021; 
9 Whereas, IC 10-14-3-12 authorizes the general assembly, by
10 concurrent resolution, to terminate a state of disaster
11 emergency at any time and specifies that, if the general
12 assembly terminates a state of disaster emergency under the
13 statute, the governor shall issue an executive order or
14 proclamation ending the state of disaster emergency; 
15 Whereas, The general assembly finds that Hoosiers are
16 responsible for and capable of protecting the health and safety
17 of themselves and their families; 
18 Whereas, The general assembly finds that Hoosiers have been
19 educated and informed on how to properly protect themselves
20 and their families from COVID-19; 
21 Whereas, The general assembly finds that the state of
22 emergency is no longer necessary to protect the health, safety,
23 and welfare of the residents of Indiana; 
24 Whereas, The general assembly finds that state agency
25 actions initiated in response to COVID-19, regardless of
26 whether the agency actions were initiated under the authority
27 of the declared public health emergency, are no longer
28 necessary to protect the health, safety, and welfare of the
29 residents of Indiana; 
30 Whereas, The general assembly finds that the various
31 restrictions imposed upon the residents of Indiana to implement
32 the state of disaster emergency are no longer necessary to
33 protect the health, safety, and welfare of the residents of
34 Indiana; and
35 Whereas, The general assembly recommends that state
36 agencies terminate, withdraw, or otherwise revoke all state
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92 5
1 agency actions, policies, or orders initiated in response to
2 COVID-19: Therefore,
3 Be it resolved by the House of Representatives
4 of the General Assembly of the State of Indiana,
5 the Senate concurring:
6 SECTION 1. That the General Assembly terminates the
7 public health emergency that was originally declared by the
8 Governor on March 6, 2020, and renewed for the twentieth time
9 on November 1, 2021, effective immediately upon the passage
10 of this resolution by the Senate.
11 SECTION 2. That the General Assembly determines that any
12 actions taken by the Governor or any requirements issued by the
13 Governor pursuant to his authority under an emergency
14 declaration are also hereby terminated.
15 SECTION 3. That copies of this resolution be transmitted by
16 the Principal Clerk of the House of Representatives to Governor
17 Eric Holcomb.
HC 3—HC 1007/DI 92