Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0004 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022
Fiscal Note January 18, 2022
Bill January 5, 2022
Fiscal Note January 5, 2022

Engrossed

Bill January 21, 2022

Amended

Bill January 20, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022