Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 149
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 372: yeas 93, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 343: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Zent, Lindauer, Barrett, Hatfield and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Vermilion and Harris
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Yoder
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Breaux
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 274: yeas 89, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Vermilion) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representatives Lindauer and Harris added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Zay added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Zent
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Vermilion
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 42: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Amendment #4 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/18/2022
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senator Charbonneau added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Senator Brown L
|
|
|