Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Public Law 151
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Returned to the Senate without amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 259: yeas 83, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative Torr added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative DeLaney added as sponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative Young J removed as sponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representative DeLaney removed as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senators Freeman and Buck added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Young M added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative DeLaney
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Young J
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 23: yeas 43, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Senator Gaskill added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Lanane
|
|
|