Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0078 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 25, 2022
Fiscal Note February 22, 2022
Fiscal Note February 21, 2022
Fiscal Note February 17, 2022
Fiscal Note January 11, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022
Bill January 6, 2022
Fiscal Note January 6, 2022
Bill December 27, 2021
Fiscal Note December 27, 2021

Enrolled

Bill February 23, 2022

Amended

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 6, 2022