House | 01/31/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senator Pol added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Cosponsors: Representatives Cherry, Aylesworth, Olthoff | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Slager | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 27: yeas 44, nays 2 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Senator Charbonneau added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/11/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |