Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 87
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 332: yeas 43, nays 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 253: yeas 67, nays 25
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Lehe
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Leonard
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 104: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Brown L
|
|
|