Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Public Law 55
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/10/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 319: yeas 36, nays 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Steuerwald) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Reread second time: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed back on second reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 40, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Freeman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Committee report: without recommendation, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Pursuant to Senate Rule 68(b); reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedure
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/04/2022
|
Authored by Senator Koch
|
|
|