Senate | 03/07/2022 | Public Law 12 | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the Governor | ||
Senate | 03/07/2022 | Signed by the President of the Senate | ||
House | 02/24/2022 | Signed by the Speaker | ||
Senate | 02/21/2022 | Signed by the President Pro Tempore | ||
House | 02/16/2022 | Returned to the Senate without amendments | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 79, nays 11 | ||
House | 02/14/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/31/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/19/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Pressel | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 19: yeas 47, nays 0 | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Senator Doriot added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/04/2022 | Authored by Senator Crider |