Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0234 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 SENATE BILL No. 234
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-3.1-35.
77 Synopsis: Child and dependent care tax credit. Provides a refundable
88 child and dependent care tax credit to taxpayers whose adjusted gross
99 income for the taxable year is not more than 250% of the federal
1010 poverty level. Provides that the credit is equal to the lesser of: (1) an
1111 amount ranging from $200 to $1,000, depending on the extent to which
1212 the taxpayer's adjusted gross income exceeds the federal poverty level;
1313 or (2) 20% of the taxpayer's employment related expenses.
1414 Effective: January 1, 2022 (retroactive).
1515 Taylor G
1616 January 6, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy.
1717 2022 IN 234—LS 6694/DI 129 Introduced
1818 Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022)
1919 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2020 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2121 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2222 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2323 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2424 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2525 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
2626 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
2727 between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
2828 SENATE BILL No. 234
2929 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3030 taxation.
3131 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3232 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-3.1-35 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3333 2 AS A NEW CHAPTER TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
3434 3 JANUARY 1, 2022 (RETROACTIVE)]:
3535 4 Chapter 35. Child and Dependent Care Tax Credit
3636 5 Sec. 1. As used in this chapter, "adjusted gross income" has the
3737 6 meaning set forth in IC 6-3-1-3.5.
3838 7 Sec. 2. (a) As used in this chapter, "employment related
3939 8 expenses" means amounts that are:
4040 9 (1) paid for the care of a qualifying individual; and
4141 10 (2) incurred to enable an individual taxpayer, including an
4242 11 individual taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint return, to be
4343 12 gainfully employed.
4444 13 (b) The term does not include an amount paid for services
4545 14 outside the taxpayer's household at a camp where a qualifying
4646 15 individual stays overnight.
4747 16 (c) The term does not include amounts paid for services outside
4848 17 the taxpayer's household that are not provided in conformity with
4949 2022 IN 234—LS 6694/DI 129 2
5050 1 applicable state and local laws.
5151 2 Sec. 3. As used in this chapter, "federal poverty level" refers to
5252 3 the poverty income guidelines published by the United States
5353 4 Department of Health and Human Services.
5454 5 Sec. 4. As used in this chapter, "qualifying individual" has the
5555 6 meaning set forth in Section 21(b)(1) of the Internal Revenue Code.
5656 7 Sec. 5. As used in this chapter, "state income tax liability"
5757 8 means the total income tax liability incurred under IC 6-3, as
5858 9 computed after application of the credits that under IC 6-3.1-1-2
5959 10 are to be applied before the credit provided by this chapter.
6060 11 Sec. 6. An individual taxpayer, including an individual
6161 12 taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint return, who has:
6262 13 (1) employment related expenses during the taxable year; and
6363 14 (2) adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted gross income
6464 15 with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint return, of not
6565 16 more than two hundred fifty percent (250%) of the federal
6666 17 poverty level for the taxable year;
6767 18 is entitled to a refundable credit against the taxpayer's state
6868 19 income tax liability for the taxable year.
6969 20 Sec. 7. The amount of a credit allowed under section 6 of this
7070 21 chapter for a taxable year is equal to the following:
7171 22 (1) The lesser of:
7272 23 (A) the amount of employment related expenses incurred
7373 24 in the taxable year multiplied by twenty percent (20%); or
7474 25 (B) one thousand dollars ($1,000);
7575 26 if the taxpayer's adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted
7676 27 gross income with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint
7777 28 return, is not more than one hundred eighty-five percent
7878 29 (185%) of the federal poverty level.
7979 30 (2) The lesser of:
8080 31 (A) the amount of employment related expenses incurred
8181 32 in the taxable year multiplied by twenty percent (20%); or
8282 33 (B) eight hundred dollars ($800);
8383 34 if the taxpayer's adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted
8484 35 gross income with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint
8585 36 return, is more than one hundred eighty-five percent (185%)
8686 37 but not more than two hundred one percent (201%) of the
8787 38 federal poverty level.
8888 39 (3) The lesser of:
8989 40 (A) the amount of employment related expenses incurred
9090 41 in the taxable year multiplied by twenty percent (20%); or
9191 42 (B) six hundred dollars ($600);
9292 2022 IN 234—LS 6694/DI 129 3
9393 1 if the taxpayer's adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted
9494 2 gross income with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint
9595 3 return, is more than two hundred one percent (201%) but not
9696 4 more than two hundred seventeen percent (217%) of the
9797 5 federal poverty level.
9898 6 (4) The lesser of:
9999 7 (A) the amount of employment related expenses incurred
100100 8 in the taxable year multiplied by twenty percent (20%); or
101101 9 (B) four hundred dollars ($400);
102102 10 if the taxpayer's adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted
103103 11 gross income with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint
104104 12 return, is more than two hundred seventeen percent (217%)
105105 13 but not more than two hundred thirty-three percent (233%)
106106 14 of the federal poverty level.
107107 15 (5) The lesser of:
108108 16 (A) the amount of employment related expenses incurred
109109 17 in the taxable year multiplied by twenty percent (20%); or
110110 18 (B) two hundred dollars ($200);
111111 19 if the taxpayer's adjusted gross income, or combined adjusted
112112 20 gross income with the taxpayer's spouse in the case of a joint
113113 21 return, is more than two hundred thirty-three percent (233%)
114114 22 but not more than two hundred fifty percent (250%) of the
115115 23 federal poverty level.
116116 24 Sec. 8. If both spouses reside in the same household, the total
117117 25 amount of the credit computed under section 7 of this chapter may
118118 26 be claimed only once.
119119 27 Sec. 9. If the credit provided under this chapter exceeds the state
120120 28 income tax liability due from the taxpayer for the taxable year, the
121121 29 excess shall be refunded to the taxpayer.
122122 30 Sec. 10. (a) The department may adopt rules under IC 4-22-2 to
123123 31 implement this chapter.
124124 32 (b) The department may require that a taxpayer apply for a
125125 33 credit under this chapter on a form designated by the department.
126126 34 SECTION 2. [EFFECTIVE JANUARY 1, 2022 (RETROACTIVE)]
127127 35 (a) IC 6-3.1-35, as added by this act, applies only to taxable years
128128 36 beginning after December 31, 2021.
129129 37 (b) This SECTION expires January 1, 2025.
130130 38 SECTION 3. An emergency is declared for this act.
131131 2022 IN 234—LS 6694/DI 129