House
|
02/08/2022
|
Representative Moseley added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Brown T
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Yoder added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Rogers added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Qaddoura added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Holdman added as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Qaddoura removed as author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Holdman removed as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/06/2022
|
Authored by Senators Qaddoura and Holdman
|
|
|