Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 128
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 346: yeas 40, nays 10
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 356: yeas 88, nays 6
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Boehnlein and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Representative Jordan added as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Representative Barrett added as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Representative Zent removed as conferee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Representative Barrett removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Barrett, Lehe and Shackleford
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Zent and Fleming
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Representative Fleming added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 271: yeas 84, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Zent) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Representatives Jordan and Barrett added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Zent
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 162: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Boehnlein) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Brown L removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senators Leising, Brown L, Becker, Yoder added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/13/2022
|
Senator Melton added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Boehnlein
|
|
|