Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Public Law 89
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 260: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Schaibley) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Representative Dvorak added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Schaibley
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Doriot) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Koch added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Koch removed as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senators Koch, Bohacek, Sandlin, Pol added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Doriot
|
|
|