Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Public Law 173
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 374: yeas 92, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 356: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Rogers and Qaddoura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Ford Jon and Ford J.D.
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Slager, Rowray, Lehman and Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Jeter and Summers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 303: yeas 67, nays 30
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #1 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 277: yeas 35, nays 57
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #7 (Jeter) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Representatives Goodrich and Young J added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative DeVon
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Jeter
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 117: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Crider added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Boehnlein added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 87: yeas 12, nays 35
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/27/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senators Ford J.D., Qaddoura, Donato added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Brown L added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Senator Holdman added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Senator Garten added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Senator Rogers added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Ford Jon
|
|
|