House | 02/01/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions and Insurance | ||
Senate | 01/21/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Senator Baldwin added as third author | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Cosponsor: Representative May | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Carbaugh | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 35: yeas 44, nays 2 | ||
Senate | 01/18/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Senator Zay added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/12/2022 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Authored by Senator Bohacek |