Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Public Law 18
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 267: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Representatives Manning and Bauer M added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 208: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Representative Hamilton added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Yoder added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Soliday
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senators Niemeyer, Qaddoura, Niezgodski, Zay, Houchin, Donato, Leising added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Koch) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/20/2022
|
Senator Glick added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Senator Charbonneau added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Koch
|
|
|