Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Public Law 109
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/07/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 348: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 340: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Ziemke, Olthoff and Fleming
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Barrett and Shackleford
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Doriot and Breaux
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Charbonneau and Yoder
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Concurrence withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2022
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/16/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Representatives Olthoff, Ledbetter C, Shackleford added as cosponsors
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 191: yeas 93, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Barrett) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Vermilion) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/26/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Pol added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senators Becker and Breaux added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Bassler added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Senator Doriot added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Barrett
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/25/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 77: yeas 46, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Charbonneau
|
|
|