Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 130
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 375: yeas 94, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 357: yeas 49, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Davis, Cook, Klinker and Pfaff
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Behning and Smith V
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Kruse and Qaddoura
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Raatz and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 269: yeas 82, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2022
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/21/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Education
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Cosponsor: Representative Jordan
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Behning
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 121: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Senator Kruse added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/10/2022
|
Authored by Senator Raatz
|
|
|