House | 02/08/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | ||
Senate | 02/02/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Senator Charbonneau added as coauthor | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Cosponsor: Representative Slager | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Aylesworth | ||
Senate | 02/01/2022 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 173: yeas 41, nays 8 | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Senator Alting added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/31/2022 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
Senate | 01/27/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
Senate | 01/10/2022 | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |