Indiana 2022 Regular Session

Indiana Senate Bill SB0357 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Fiscal Note February 24, 2022
Fiscal Note February 15, 2022
Fiscal Note February 14, 2022
Fiscal Note February 10, 2022
Fiscal Note January 25, 2022
Fiscal Note January 24, 2022
Fiscal Note January 21, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022
Fiscal Note January 10, 2022
Bill January 10, 2022

Engrossed

Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022

Enrolled

Bill February 23, 2022

Amended

Bill February 23, 2022
Bill February 10, 2022
Bill January 24, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022