Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Public Law 135
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/15/2022
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/09/2022
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 391: yeas 70, nays 22
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Senator Randolph added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 362: yeas 50, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2022
|
Senator Melton added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski added as advisor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senator Melton added as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski removed as conferee
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/03/2022
|
Senator Melton removed as advisor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House advisors appointed: Rowray, Jordan, Aylesworth, Cherry, Thompson, Snow and Porter
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
House conferees appointed: Brown T and Hamilton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate advisors appointed: Holdman and Melton
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Senate conferees appointed: Mishler and Niezgodski
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Senate dissented from House amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2022
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Returned to the Senate with amendments
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 300: yeas 69, nays 27
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #5 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 281: yeas 24, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #3 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 280: yeas 27, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #2 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 279: yeas 24, nays 67
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #13 (Judy) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #12 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Appeal the ruling of the chair (Hamilton); ruling of the chair sustained. Roll Call 278: yeas 64, nays 28
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #6 (Hamilton) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #9 (Heine) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Amendment #10 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Representative Hamilton added as cosponsor
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/02/2022
|
Referred to the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Cosponsors: Representatives Snow C and Jordan
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
House sponsor: Representative Brown T
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 48, nays 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senators Buck, Gaskill, Alting added as coauthors
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/01/2022
|
Senator Niezgodski added as third author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Amendment #1 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/31/2022
|
Senator Busch added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/24/2022
|
Senator Holdman added as second author
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
01/11/2022
|
Authored by Senator Mishler
|
|
|