1 | 1 | | |
---|
2 | 2 | | Introduced Version |
---|
3 | 3 | | SENATE BILL No. 394 |
---|
4 | 4 | | _____ |
---|
5 | 5 | | DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL |
---|
6 | 6 | | Citations Affected: IC 34-18. |
---|
7 | 7 | | Synopsis: Medical malpractice. Provides that medical bills and |
---|
8 | 8 | | medical expenses incurred in connection with the alleged injury or |
---|
9 | 9 | | death of a patient are excluded from the maximum amount of damages |
---|
10 | 10 | | that may be recovered in a medical malpractice action. Increases the |
---|
11 | 11 | | amount that a health care provider is liable for in a medical malpractice |
---|
12 | 12 | | action from $500,000 to $600,000 after June 30, 2022. Provides that |
---|
13 | 13 | | recoverable medical expenses incurred in connection with the injury or |
---|
14 | 14 | | death of a patient due from a judgment or settlement in a medical |
---|
15 | 15 | | malpractice action shall be paid by the health care provider. Reduces |
---|
16 | 16 | | the amount that a plaintiff's attorney may receive in a medical |
---|
17 | 17 | | malpractice action from 32% to 25% of any recovery after June 30, |
---|
18 | 18 | | 2022. |
---|
19 | 19 | | Effective: July 1, 2022. |
---|
20 | 20 | | Niemeyer |
---|
21 | 21 | | January 11, 2022, read first time and referred to Committee on Judiciary. |
---|
22 | 22 | | 2022 IN 394—LS 7050/DI 149 Introduced |
---|
23 | 23 | | Second Regular Session of the 122nd General Assembly (2022) |
---|
24 | 24 | | PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana |
---|
25 | 25 | | Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type, |
---|
26 | 26 | | additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type. |
---|
27 | 27 | | Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional |
---|
28 | 28 | | provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the |
---|
29 | 29 | | word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds |
---|
30 | 30 | | a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution. |
---|
31 | 31 | | Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts |
---|
32 | 32 | | between statutes enacted by the 2021 Regular Session of the General Assembly. |
---|
33 | 33 | | SENATE BILL No. 394 |
---|
34 | 34 | | A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning civil |
---|
35 | 35 | | procedure. |
---|
36 | 36 | | Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana: |
---|
37 | 37 | | 1 SECTION 1. IC 34-18-14-3, AS AMENDED BY P.L.182-2016, |
---|
38 | 38 | | 2 SECTION 9, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
39 | 39 | | 3 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 3. (a) The total amount recoverable for an injury |
---|
40 | 40 | | 4 or death of a patient, not including recovery for medical bills and |
---|
41 | 41 | | 5 medical expenses incurred in connection with the injury or death |
---|
42 | 42 | | 6 of a patient, may not exceed the following: |
---|
43 | 43 | | 7 (1) Five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000) for an act of |
---|
44 | 44 | | 8 malpractice that occurs before January 1, 1990. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 9 (2) Seven hundred fifty thousand dollars ($750,000) for an act of |
---|
46 | 46 | | 10 malpractice that occurs: |
---|
47 | 47 | | 11 (A) after December 31, 1989; and |
---|
48 | 48 | | 12 (B) before July 1, 1999. |
---|
49 | 49 | | 13 (3) One million two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($1,250,000) |
---|
50 | 50 | | 14 for an act of malpractice that occurs: |
---|
51 | 51 | | 15 (A) after June 30, 1999; and |
---|
52 | 52 | | 16 (B) before July 1, 2017. |
---|
53 | 53 | | 17 (4) One million six hundred fifty thousand dollars ($1,650,000) |
---|
54 | 54 | | 2022 IN 394—LS 7050/DI 149 2 |
---|
55 | 55 | | 1 for an act of malpractice that occurs: |
---|
56 | 56 | | 2 (A) after June 30, 2017; and |
---|
57 | 57 | | 3 (B) before July 1, 2019. |
---|
58 | 58 | | 4 (5) One million eight hundred thousand dollars ($1,800,000) for |
---|
59 | 59 | | 5 an act of malpractice that occurs after June 30, 2019. |
---|
60 | 60 | | 6 (b) Except as provided in subsection (e), a health care provider |
---|
61 | 61 | | 7 qualified under this article (or IC 27-12 before its repeal) is not liable |
---|
62 | 62 | | 8 for an amount in excess of the following: |
---|
63 | 63 | | 9 (1) Two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for an act of |
---|
64 | 64 | | 10 malpractice that occurs: |
---|
65 | 65 | | 11 (A) after June 30, 1999; and |
---|
66 | 66 | | 12 (B) before July 1, 2017. |
---|
67 | 67 | | 13 (2) Four hundred thousand dollars ($400,000) for an act of |
---|
68 | 68 | | 14 malpractice that occurs: |
---|
69 | 69 | | 15 (A) after June 30, 2017; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | 16 (B) before July 1, 2019. |
---|
71 | 71 | | 17 (3) Five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000) for an act of |
---|
72 | 72 | | 18 malpractice that occurs after June 30, 2019, and before July 1, |
---|
73 | 73 | | 19 2022. |
---|
74 | 74 | | 20 (4) Six hundred thousand dollars ($600,000) for an act of |
---|
75 | 75 | | 21 malpractice that occurs after June 30, 2022. |
---|
76 | 76 | | 22 (c) Any amount due from a judgment or settlement that is in excess |
---|
77 | 77 | | 23 of the total liability of all liable health care providers, subject to |
---|
78 | 78 | | 24 subsections (a), (b), and (d), and (e), shall be paid from the patient's |
---|
79 | 79 | | 25 compensation fund under IC 34-18-15. |
---|
80 | 80 | | 26 (d) If a health care provider qualified under this article (or IC 27-12 |
---|
81 | 81 | | 27 before its repeal) admits liability or is adjudicated liable solely by |
---|
82 | 82 | | 28 reason of the conduct of another health care provider who is an officer, |
---|
83 | 83 | | 29 agent, or employee of the health care provider acting in the course and |
---|
84 | 84 | | 30 scope of employment and qualified under this article (or IC 27-12 |
---|
85 | 85 | | 31 before its repeal), the total amount that shall be paid to the claimant on |
---|
86 | 86 | | 32 behalf of the officer, agent, or employee and the health care provider |
---|
87 | 87 | | 33 by the health care provider or its insurer is the following: |
---|
88 | 88 | | 34 (1) Two hundred fifty thousand dollars ($250,000) for an act of |
---|
89 | 89 | | 35 malpractice that occurs: |
---|
90 | 90 | | 36 (A) after June 30, 1999; and |
---|
91 | 91 | | 37 (B) before July 1, 2017. |
---|
92 | 92 | | 38 (2) Four hundred thousand dollars ($400,000) for an act of |
---|
93 | 93 | | 39 malpractice that occurs: |
---|
94 | 94 | | 40 (A) after June 30, 2017; and |
---|
95 | 95 | | 41 (B) before July 1, 2019. |
---|
96 | 96 | | 42 (3) Five hundred thousand dollars ($500,000) for an act of |
---|
97 | 97 | | 2022 IN 394—LS 7050/DI 149 3 |
---|
98 | 98 | | 1 malpractice that occurs after June 30, 2019, and before July 1, |
---|
99 | 99 | | 2 2022. |
---|
100 | 100 | | 3 (4) Six hundred thousand dollars ($600,000) for an act of |
---|
101 | 101 | | 4 malpractice that occurs after June 30, 2022. |
---|
102 | 102 | | 5 The balance of an adjudicated amount to which the claimant is entitled |
---|
103 | 103 | | 6 shall be paid by other liable health care providers or the patient's |
---|
104 | 104 | | 7 compensation fund, or both. |
---|
105 | 105 | | 8 (e) All recoverable medical expenses incurred in connection with |
---|
106 | 106 | | 9 the injury or death of a patient due from a judgment or settlement |
---|
107 | 107 | | 10 shall be paid by the health care provider. |
---|
108 | 108 | | 11 SECTION 2. IC 34-18-18-1, AS AMENDED BY P.L.182-2016, |
---|
109 | 109 | | 12 SECTION 12, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE |
---|
110 | 110 | | 13 JULY 1, 2022]: Sec. 1. When a plaintiff is represented by an attorney |
---|
111 | 111 | | 14 in the prosecution of the plaintiff's claim subject to IC 34-18-8-4, the |
---|
112 | 112 | | 15 plaintiff's attorney's fees may not exceed, for an act of malpractice |
---|
113 | 113 | | 16 committed: |
---|
114 | 114 | | 17 (1) before July 1, 2017, fifteen percent (15%) of any recovery |
---|
115 | 115 | | 18 from the fund; and |
---|
116 | 116 | | 19 (2) after June 30, 2017, and before July 1, 2022, thirty-two |
---|
117 | 117 | | 20 percent (32%) of any recovery under IC 34-18-14-3; and |
---|
118 | 118 | | 21 (3) after June 30, 2022, twenty-five percent (25%) of any |
---|
119 | 119 | | 22 recovery under IC 34-18-14-3. |
---|
120 | 120 | | 2022 IN 394—LS 7050/DI 149 |
---|