House | 02/16/2022 | Returned to the Senate | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Second reading: adopted Roll Call 195: yeas 92, nays 0 | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Representative Porter added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/15/2022 | Representative Summers added as cosponsor | ||
House | 02/10/2022 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/27/2022 | First reading: referred to the Committee on Roads and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/25/2022 | Referred to the House | ||
Senate | 01/24/2022 | Senator Sandlin added as second author | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Senators Alting, Baldwin, Bassler, Becker, Boehnlein, Bohacek, Boots, Bray, Breaux, Brown L, Buchanan, Buck, Busch, Charbonneau, Crane, Donato, Doriot, Ford J.D., Ford Jon, Freeman, Garten, Gaskill, Glick, Holdman, Houchin, Koch, Kruse, Lanane, Leising, Melton, Messmer, Mishler, Niemeyer, Niezgodski, Perfect, Pol, Qaddoura, Raatz, Randolph, Rogers, Taylor G, Tomes, Walker G, Walker K, Yoder, Young M, Zay added as coauthors | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | House sponsor: Representative Speedy | ||
Senate | 01/20/2022 | Second reading: adopted voice vote | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation | ||
Senate | 01/13/2022 | Authored by Senator Crider |