Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #58 (Hunley) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #46 (Qaddoura) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #45 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 417: yeas 10, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #44 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 416: yeas 10, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #27 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 406: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #41 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 415: yeas 10, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #38 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 414: yeas 12, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #37 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 413: yeas 10, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #36 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 412: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #35 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 411: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #33 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 410: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #31 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 409: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #30 (Qaddoura) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #29 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 408: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #28 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 407: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #24 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 405: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #22 (Qaddoura) failed; Roll Call 404: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #84 (Niezgodski) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #49 (Niezgodski) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #55 (Pol) failed; Roll Call 403: yeas 12, nays 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #56 (Pol) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #20 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 402: yeas 13, nays 36
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #19 (Yoder) failed; Roll Call 401: yeas 12, nays 37
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #17 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 400: yeas 15, nays 34
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #16 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 399: yeas 10, nays 39
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #13 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 398: yeas 11, nays 38
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #12 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Walker G) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #67 (Messmer) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #60 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #72 (Bohacek) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2023
|
Amendment #74 (Mishler) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Mishler and Garten
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 234: yeas 66, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #11 (GiaQuinta) failed; Roll Call 205: yeas 26, nays 61
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #16 (DeLaney) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #12 (Hamilton) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #13 (Pryor) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Sweet) prevailed; Roll Call 204: yeas 53, nays 34
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #14 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 203: yeas 28, nays 62
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Thompson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Representative Thompson
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Porter and Cherry
|
|
|