House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 205
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 470: yeas 39, nays 7
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/20/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 459: yeas 91, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/19/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Pol and Crider
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: McNamara, Thompson, Jordan and Gore
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Steuerwald and Moseley
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/12/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Senator Alting added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 367: yeas 48, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/10/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Johnson) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Randolph added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Johnson added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2023
|
Senator Becker added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 49: yeas 99, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Freeman, Crider, Koch
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Representative Steuerwald
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives McNamara, Jeter and Moseley
|
|
|