House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 206
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 488: yeas 66, nays 29
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 382: yeas 38, nays 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Crane added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2023
|
Senator Rogers added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/01/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Koch, Busch
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Hostettler added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 238: yeas 66, nays 30
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representative Wesco added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Representatives Soliday, Prescott, Abbott D, McGuire J, Morris, Lehman, May, Teshka J, Bartels, Judy, Greene R, Lauer, Goodrich, Mayfield, Snow C, Davis M, Morrison, Borders, Behning, Haggard C, Culp K, Lucas, Sweet L, Frye, Aylesworth, Ledbetter C, Payne Z, Engleman, Heaton, Cherry, Jordan, Patterson L, Vermilion A, Barrett, DeVon, Criswell C, Steuerwald, King J, Miller D, Pressel, Cash B, Jeter C, Heine added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2023
|
Rule 105.1 suspended
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #9 (DeLaney) ruled out of order
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #8 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 215: yeas 29, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #4 (Bauer M) failed; Roll Call 213: yeas 28, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #2 (Gore) failed; Roll Call 212: yeas 29, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Harris) failed; Roll Call 211: yeas 29, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #6 (Johnson) failed; Roll Call 210: yeas 29, nays 64
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #3 (Gore) failed; Roll Call 209: yeas 29, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #5 (Hatfield) failed; Roll Call 208: yeas 29, nays 65
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #10 (Hatfield) failed; Roll Call 216: yeas 29, nays 63
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
Amendment #7 (Johnson) failed; Roll Call 214: yeas 29, nays 66
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Authored by Representative Manning
|
|
|
House
|
01/12/2023
|
Coauthored by Representatives Speedy and Lindauer
|
|
|