House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 209
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 506: yeas 49, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 523: yeas 88, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
CCR # 1 filed in the House
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Holdman and Pol
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Rogers and Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Goodrich, Teshka and Miller K
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
House conferees appointed: Torr and Campbell
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/14/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 383: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/11/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Senator Koch added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/06/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 114: yeas 95, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Holdman, Baldwin, Randolph Lonnie M
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Representative Torr
|
|
|