Senate
|
03/16/2023
|
Senator Dernulc added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2023
|
Senator Yoder added as cosponsor
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 115: yeas 96, nays 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Ford Jon, Niezgodski, Mishler
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Representative Porter added as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Cherry) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2023
|
Representative Judy removed as coauthor
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127
|
|
|
House
|
02/02/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/19/2023
|
Representatives Judy and Meltzer J added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Representative Cherry
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Karickhoff
|
|
|