Senate | 02/23/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | ||
House | 01/31/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 39: yeas 77, nays 19 | ||
House | 01/30/2023 | Senate sponsor: Senator Freeman | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Amendment #6 (Jeter) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | ||
House | 01/24/2023 | Placed back on second reading | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Amendment #2 (Hatfield) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Amendment #1 (Moed) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 01/23/2023 | Amendment #4 (Jeter) prevailed; voice vote | ||
House | 01/19/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/09/2023 | Authored by Representative Jeter |