Indiana 2023 Regular Session

Indiana House Bill HB1082 Compare Versions

Only one version of the bill is available at this time.
OldNewDifferences
11
22 Introduced Version
33 HOUSE BILL No. 1082
44 _____
55 DIGEST OF INTRODUCED BILL
66 Citations Affected: IC 6-1.1-4.
77 Synopsis: Assessment procedures. Requires a township or county
88 assessor to document any changes made to the parcel characteristics of
99 real property from the previous year's assessment in an assessment of
1010 the real property. Provides that in an appeal of the assessment, the
1111 township or county assessor has the burden of proving the validity of
1212 any change to the parcel characteristics. Allows a taxpayer to submit
1313 a preferred appraisal approach for assessment of certain rental
1414 property. Provides that, on appeal, if a township or county assessor has
1515 failed to use the preferred appraisal approach, the taxpayer shall be
1616 awarded reasonable attorney's fees, court costs, and other reasonable
1717 expenses.
1818 Effective: July 1, 2023.
1919 Teshka, Manning
2020 January 9, 2023, read first time and referred to Committee on Ways and Means.
2121 2023 IN 1082—LS 6499/DI 125 Introduced
2222 First Regular Session of the 123rd General Assembly (2023)
2323 PRINTING CODE. Amendments: Whenever an existing statute (or a section of the Indiana
2424 Constitution) is being amended, the text of the existing provision will appear in this style type,
2525 additions will appear in this style type, and deletions will appear in this style type.
2626 Additions: Whenever a new statutory provision is being enacted (or a new constitutional
2727 provision adopted), the text of the new provision will appear in this style type. Also, the
2828 word NEW will appear in that style type in the introductory clause of each SECTION that adds
2929 a new provision to the Indiana Code or the Indiana Constitution.
3030 Conflict reconciliation: Text in a statute in this style type or this style type reconciles conflicts
3131 between statutes enacted by the 2022 Regular Session of the General Assembly.
3232 HOUSE BILL No. 1082
3333 A BILL FOR AN ACT to amend the Indiana Code concerning
3434 taxation.
3535 Be it enacted by the General Assembly of the State of Indiana:
3636 1 SECTION 1. IC 6-1.1-4-4.9 IS ADDED TO THE INDIANA CODE
3737 2 AS A NEW SECTION TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE JULY
3838 3 1, 2023]: Sec. 4.9. (a) This section applies to an assessment:
3939 4 (1) under section 4.2 or 4.5 of this chapter or another law; and
4040 5 (2) occurring after December 31, 2023.
4141 6 (b) If the township assessor, or the county assessor if there is no
4242 7 township assessor for the township, changes the underlying parcel
4343 8 characteristics, including age, grade, or condition, of a property
4444 9 from the previous year's assessment date, the township or county
4545 10 assessor shall document:
4646 11 (1) each change; and
4747 12 (2) the reason that each change was made.
4848 13 In any appeal of the assessment, the township or county assessor
4949 14 has the burden of proving that each change was valid.
5050 15 SECTION 2. IC 6-1.1-4-39, AS AMENDED BY P.L.111-2014,
5151 16 SECTION 15, IS AMENDED TO READ AS FOLLOWS [EFFECTIVE
5252 17 JULY 1, 2023]: Sec. 39. (a) For assessment dates after February 28,
5353 2023 IN 1082—LS 6499/DI 125 2
5454 1 2005, except as provided in subsections (c) and (e), and subject to
5555 2 subsection (f), the true tax value of real property regularly used to rent
5656 3 or otherwise furnish residential accommodations for periods of thirty
5757 4 (30) days or more and that has more than four (4) rental units is the
5858 5 lowest valuation determined by applying each of the following
5959 6 appraisal approaches:
6060 7 (1) Cost approach that includes an estimated reproduction or
6161 8 replacement cost of buildings and land improvements as of the
6262 9 date of valuation together with estimates of the losses in value
6363 10 that have taken place due to wear and tear, design and plan, or
6464 11 neighborhood influences.
6565 12 (2) Sales comparison approach, using data for generally
6666 13 comparable property.
6767 14 (3) Income capitalization approach, using an applicable
6868 15 capitalization method and appropriate capitalization rates that are
6969 16 developed and used in computations that lead to an indication of
7070 17 value commensurate with the risks for the subject property use.
7171 18 (b) The gross rent multiplier method is the preferred method of
7272 19 valuing:
7373 20 (1) real property that has at least one (1) and not more than four
7474 21 (4) rental units; and
7575 22 (2) mobile homes assessed under IC 6-1.1-7.
7676 23 (c) A township assessor (if any) or the county assessor is not
7777 24 required to appraise real property referred to in subsection (a) using the
7878 25 three (3) appraisal approaches listed in subsection (a) if the assessor
7979 26 and the taxpayer agree before notice of the assessment is given to the
8080 27 taxpayer under section 22 of this chapter to the determination of the
8181 28 true tax value of the property by the assessor using one (1) of those
8282 29 appraisal approaches.
8383 30 (d) To carry out this section, the department of local government
8484 31 finance may adopt rules for assessors to use in gathering and
8585 32 processing information for the application of the income capitalization
8686 33 method and the gross rent multiplier method. If a taxpayer wishes to
8787 34 have the income capitalization method or the gross rent multiplier
8888 35 method used in the initial formulation of the assessment of the
8989 36 taxpayer's property, the taxpayer must submit the necessary information
9090 37 to the assessor not later than the assessment date. However, the
9191 38 taxpayer is not prejudiced in any way and is not restricted in pursuing
9292 39 an appeal, if the data is not submitted by the assessment date. A
9393 40 taxpayer must verify under penalties for perjury any information
9494 41 provided to the township or county assessor for use in the application
9595 42 of either method. All information related to earnings, income, profits,
9696 2023 IN 1082—LS 6499/DI 125 3
9797 1 losses, or expenditures that is provided to the assessor under this
9898 2 section is confidential under IC 6-1.1-35-9 to the same extent as
9999 3 information related to earnings, income, profits, losses, or expenditures
100100 4 of personal property is confidential under IC 6-1.1-35-9.
101101 5 (e) The true tax value of low income rental property (as defined in
102102 6 section 41 of this chapter) is not determined under subsection (a). The
103103 7 assessment method prescribed in section 41 of this chapter is the
104104 8 exclusive method for assessment of that property. This subsection does
105105 9 not impede any rights to appeal an assessment.
106106 10 (f) If a taxpayer wishes to have a preferred appraisal approach
107107 11 used in the assessment of a taxpayer's property described in
108108 12 subsection (a), the taxpayer must submit the necessary information
109109 13 to the assessor not later than the assessment date. If a taxpayer
110110 14 requests the application of a preferred appraisal approach under
111111 15 this subsection, the township or county assessor shall use the
112112 16 preferred appraisal approach in the assessment of the taxpayer's
113113 17 property.
114114 18 (g) If, on appeal or judicial review of an assessment described
115115 19 in this section, the county property tax assessment board of
116116 20 appeals, Indiana board, or court, as applicable, finds that the
117117 21 township or county assessor failed to use the preferred appraisal
118118 22 approach as timely submitted by the taxpayer under subsection (f),
119119 23 the county property tax assessment board of appeals, Indiana
120120 24 board, or court, as applicable, shall award the taxpayer reasonable
121121 25 attorney's fees, court costs, and other reasonable expenses in an
122122 26 amount not to exceed five thousand dollars ($5,000).
123123 27 SECTION 3. [EFFECTIVE JULY 1, 2023] (a) IC 6-1.1-4-39, as
124124 28 amended by this act, applies to assessment dates occurring after
125125 29 December 31, 2023.
126126 30 (b) This SECTION expires July 1, 2026.
127127 2023 IN 1082—LS 6499/DI 125