House
|
05/04/2023
|
Public Law 212
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2023
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Signed by the Speaker
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President of the Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/28/2023
|
Signed by the President Pro Tempore
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2023
|
House concurred in Senate amendments; Roll Call 478: yeas 90, nays 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2023
|
Motion to concur filed
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2023
|
Dissent withdrawn
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate advisors appointed: Qaddoura and Glick
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/13/2023
|
Senate conferees appointed: Freeman and Taylor G
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House advisors appointed: Meltzer, King and Gore
|
|
|
House
|
04/06/2023
|
House conferees appointed: McNamara and Moed
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2023
|
House dissented from Senate amendments
|
|
|
House
|
04/03/2023
|
Motion to dissent filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/31/2023
|
Returned to the House with amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/30/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 278: yeas 47, nays 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/28/2023
|
Amendment #1 (Taylor G) prevailed; voice vote
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/21/2023
|
Committee report: do pass, adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2023
|
Referred to the Senate
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Third reading: passed; Roll Call 116: yeas 95, nays 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2023
|
Senate sponsors: Senators Taylor G, Freeman, Qaddoura
|
|
|
House
|
02/13/2023
|
Second reading: ordered engrossed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2023
|
Committee report: amend do pass, adopted
|
|
|
House
|
01/30/2023
|
Representatives Morris, McNamara, Gore M added as coauthors
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code
|
|
|
House
|
01/09/2023
|
Authored by Representative Moed
|
|
|