Senate | 03/20/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy | ||
Senate | 02/28/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections | ||
House | 02/21/2023 | Referred to the Senate | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Representative Pierce K added as coauthor | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 164: yeas 73, nays 24 | ||
House | 02/20/2023 | Senate sponsors: Senators Walker G and Ford Jon | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | ||
House | 02/16/2023 | Amendment #8 (DeLaney) failed; Roll Call 141: yeas 26, nays 64 | ||
House | 02/09/2023 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 | ||
House | 01/26/2023 | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | First reading: referred to Committee on Elections and Apportionment | ||
House | 01/10/2023 | Authored by Representative Wesco |